Bortnick, Jessica Eve (CPSO#: 81134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 31
70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1B9
Canada
Phone: 647-343-0207
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Bortnick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bortnick ( CPSO# 81134 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Business Address:
31 - 70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1B9
Phone Number: (647) 343-0207

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Oct 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA EVE BORTNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORTNICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 16 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2005 to 15 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2006