Boscariol, Rya Heather (CPSO#: 88600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-675-4733
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

205 Douglas Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1E9
Canada
Phone: 705-523-4900
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rya Boscariol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Boscariol ( CPSO# 88600 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Thunder Bay ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYA HEATHER BOSCARIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSCARIOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014