Bosch, Mark Jonathan (CPSO#: 90167)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 12 Jan 2009 to 24 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Queen's University, 25 Jan 2009 to 07 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 13 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2009