Boshart, Samantha Leigh (CPSO#: 96317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
785 Techumseh Rd
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 4K9
Phone: 5193975455
Fax: 5196274436
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA LEIGH BOSHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSHART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015