Botha, Nicolaas Jacobus (CPSO#: 90111)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of the Orange Free State, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicolaas Botha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013