Bothwell, Jody North (CPSO#: 73161)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1998
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 18 Nov 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 18 Jan 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Nov 2003
Summary:

 On November 18, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that      Dr. Bothwell has committed an 
 actof
professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 in that he has 
 engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  The Committee ordered and directed the following:

1.	That the Registrar suspend 
 Dr. Bothwell(s certificate of registration for a period of two 	months, commencing on November 18, 
 2003 at 11:59 p.m.;
2.	That Dr. Bothwell successfully complete the College(s Boundaries course 
 within six months;
3.	That the following terms and conditions be placed on Dr. Bothwell(s 
 certificate of 	registration:

(a)	Dr. Bothwell will not examine, assess, or provide any medical 
 services to any female patient (other than surgery in a hospital operating room) unless 
 accompanied by a female member of the College of Nurses of Ontario or the College of Physicians 
 and Surgeons of Ontario ((CPSO();
(b)	Dr. Bothwell will record in his patient charts which member 
 of the College of Nurses of Ontario or the CPSO was present for each of the interactions with 
 female patients described in (a) above; and 
(c)	Dr. Bothwell will allow access by the College to 
 his OHIP billing records and patient records from time to time for the purpose of verifying 
 compliance with conditions (a) and (b) above.

4.	That Dr. Bothwell to attend before it to be 
 reprimanded;

5.	That Dr. Bothwell pay costs in the amount of $2,500.00; and 

6.	That the results 
 of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 18, 2003