Bothwell, Stuart Mckay (CPSO#: 89085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone: (705) 880-0501
Fax: (705) 880-0505
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Stuart Bothwell & Naomi Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bothwell ( CPSO# 89085 )
Dr. N. Nicholson ( CPSO# 89482 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
208 - 189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone Number: (705) 880-0501

Business Address:
Centre for Dermatology
775 Monoghan Road South
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone Number: (705) 775-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART MCKAY BOTHWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTHWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010