Botkin, Colin David (CPSO#: 94707)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2011 to 09 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2011 to 14 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Feb 2012 to 23 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2016