Botschner, Monika Karen (CPSO#: 94620)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016