Bottoni, David Anthony (CPSO#: 82439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone: (519) 631-0567
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Bottoni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bottoni ( CPSO# 82439 )

Business Address:
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 631-0567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY BOTTONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTTONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013