Bouazza, Djamel (CPSO#: 82430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:INST NATIONAL D'ENSEIGNEMENT SUPERIEUR, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bouazza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DJAMEL BOUAZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUAZZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006