Boucher, Liza (CPSO#: 96212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Forensic Pathology Service 25 Morton Shulman Avenue Toronto, ON M3M 0B1
Date Received: 30 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIZA BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2018