Bougie, Olga (CPSO#: 90669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Antoniouk, Olga (used until: 02 May 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department Of Obstetrics
And Gynaecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7840
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olga Bougie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Bougie ( CPSO# 90669 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLGA BOUGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUGIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 14 Nov 2011 to 11 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015