Boulanger, Maude (CPSO#: 92868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone: (905) 841-8790
Fax: 9058418978
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chugh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boulanger ( CPSO# 92868 )
Dr. T. Chugh ( CPSO# 84794 )

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAUDE BOULANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012