Bould, Matthew Dylan (CPSO#: 87011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hosp Of Eastern Ontario
Department Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dylan Bould Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bould ( CPSO# 87011 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Rwanda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Matthew Dylan Bould may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Bould holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bould no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.