Bourgault, Louise Anne (CPSO#: 67090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
300-100 Marie Curie Pvte
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Bourgault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bourgault ( CPSO# 67090 )

Business Address:
300-100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE ANNE BOURGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995