Bourke, Richard Anthony (CPSO#: 22261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 06 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 6, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Richard Anthony Bourke,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Bourke has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. RICHARD ANTHONY BOURKE
                                          ("Dr. Bourke")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bourke, certificate of registration number 22261, am a member of
                  the College. I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my management of my practice and medical record keeping. I was
                  required to undergo a reassessment of my practice. Since that time, I
                  have retired from obstetrical practice and now focus on providing
                  surgical assistance. In lieu of the reassessment, I am providing the
                  College with this undertaking.

            (3)   I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that I currently practice only at Windsor
                  Regional Hospital. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that I do not practice or have privileges at
                  any practice location, including but not limited to, any hospitals,
                  clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction other than Windsor Regional
                  Hospital (collectively, my "Practice Location(s)"). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Bourke, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bourke, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice of
                        medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient(s)
                        whatsoever.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bourke, undertake that the entirety of my scope of practice
                        will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall only practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                              surgeon:
                  
                              a.    certified by the Royal College of Physicians and
                                    Surgeons or recognized as a surgical specialist by the
                                    College; and
                  
                              b.    who holds privileges at Windsor Regional Hospital, or
                                    other Practice Location as may be approved by the
                                    College,
                  
                                    (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon"); and
                  
                        (ii)  for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                              section (6)(b)(i) above:
                  
                              a.    I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative
                                    care whatsoever; and
                  
                              b.    a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in
                                    attendance when I am engaging in my practice as a
                                    surgical assistant.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bourke, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (6)(b) above.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bourke, undertake that I will not commence surgical
                        assisting at any Practice Location (other than Windsor Regional
                        Hospital) without prior approval of the College. Should I seek
                        privileges to perform surgical assisting at any other Practice
                        Location, I shall advise the College within five (5) days of making
                        such application, and shall apply at least fourteen (14) days
                        before I plan to commence surgical assisting at that location. 
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Bourke, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations by a College
                  representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the
                  provisions of this Undertaking.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Qualified Surgeon and any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with
                  similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Bourke's
                              management of his practice and medical record keeping, for
                              which Dr. Bourke was required to undergo a reassessment. Dr.
                              Bourke has since retired from obstetrical practice and
                              restricted his practice as follows:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Bourke will practice only as a surgical
                                          assistant under the direction of a qualified
                                          surgeon. 
                                    *     Dr. Bourke will practice only at Windsor Regional
                                          Hospital.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Bourke, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Bourke, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A".

            (17)  I, Dr. Bourke, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Qualified Surgeon(s) and Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising
                  from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Bourke, give my irrevocable consent to any Qualified Surgeon and
                  any Chief of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, all
                  information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes
                  of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Anthony Bourke to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 6, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Bourke’s management of his practice and medical record keeping, for which Dr. Bourke was required to undergo a reassessment. Dr. Bourke has since retired from obstetrical practice and restricted his practice as follows:

Dr. Bourke will practice only as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon.
Dr. Bourke will practice only at Windsor Regional Hospital.