Bourns, Laura Elizabeth (CPSO#: 92990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Public Health
7120 Hurontario St
PO Box 667 RPO Streetsville
Mississauga ON  L5M 2C1
Phone: 905-791-7800
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH BOURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016