Bourns, Robert Evans (CPSO#: 28427)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bourns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bourns ( CPSO# 89028 )
Dr. R. Bourns ( CPSO# 28427 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Halton Hills Family Health 171 Guelph St Georgetown ON L7G 4A1
Date Received: 03 Dec 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2019