Bourque, Jean-Marc (CPSO#: 91925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-MARC BOURQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2011 to 27 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2017