Boutillier, Anna Lois Wanda (CPSO#: 97696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Ross University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Craig St
Russell ON  K4R 1A1
Phone: 613-445-5333
Fax: 613-445-3659
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Boutillier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boutillier ( CPSO# 97696 )

Business Address:
110 Craig Street
Russell ON  K4R 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 445-5333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA LOIS WANDA BOUTILLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTILLIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015