Bovett, Geoffrey Patrick (CPSO#: 71171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2 Reception
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5000 Ext. 5248
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bovett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bovett ( CPSO# 71171 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5248

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Geoffrey   Patrick  Bovett  may  practise  medicine  independently  as  a
            hospitalist in medical oncology, only.