Bovo, Michel (CPSO#: 80333)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2011