Bowdin, Sarah Claire Chantal (CPSO#: 89621)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017