Bowes, Beverley Lynette Burt (CPSO#: 72101)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 1998 to 05 Apr 1998
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002