Bowry, Ashna Deepak Kumar (CPSO#: 89773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Bristol, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 80 Bond
St Michael's Hospital
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
Tropical Diseases Unit
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Canada
Phone: 4163403675
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashna Bowry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bowry ( CPSO# 89773 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Health Centre
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5A 4P5
Phone Number: (416) 864-3011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHNA DEEPAK KUMAR BOWRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010