Bowry, Richard (CPSO#: 78264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr Rice Cosmetic Clinic
133 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Cumberland Clinic
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925 0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Bowry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bowry ( CPSO# 78264 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
133 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1

Business Address:
The Cumberland Clinic
162 Cumberland Street
Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD BOWRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011