Boyd, Alyssa Robinson (CPSO#: 79160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West End Family Practice
Unit 2
30-45th Street
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0A6
Phone: (705) 429-9445
Fax: (705) 429-9588
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood General and
Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

240 Eerie street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0X8
Canada
Phone: 705-444-2555
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alyssa Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boyd ( CPSO# 79160 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay Family Health Team
Suite 100
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 445-9711

Business Address:
240 Eerie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0X8
Phone Number: (705) 444-2555

Business Address:
West End Family Practice
Unit 2
30-45th Street South
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0A6
Phone Number: (705) 429-9445

Business Address:
Collingwood General and
Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYSSA ROBINSON BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005