Boyd, Kirsty Usher (CPSO#: 80802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Surgery
1053 Carling Avenue
Box 213
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19798
Fax: (613) 761-4635
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Plastic Surgery
502-1525 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z8R9
Canada
Phone: 6137924137
Fax: 6137921522
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirsty Usher Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Boyd ( CPSO# 80802 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Surgery
1053 Carling Avenue
Box 213
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTY USHER BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009