Boyd, Shelley Romayne (CPSO#: 65631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Suite 505
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2893
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

491 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 4J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 434-2669
Fax: (905) 434-3807
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shelley Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boyd ( CPSO# 65631 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
505 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
491 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 434-7768

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY ROMAYNE BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993