Boylan, Colm Edmund (CPSO#: 78775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Aug 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33152
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colm Boylan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2007


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 19 Aug 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Colm Edmund Boylan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr.  Boylan  holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Boylan  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.