Boyle, Matthew Thomas (CPSO#: 95908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Suite FG-38
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 4089
Fax: 416-480-5119
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab Campus
Suite S-211
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Canada
Phone: 416-226-6780
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW THOMAS BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016