Boyle, Shawna Lee (CPSO#: 89599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Nebraska
Medical Center
Omaha NE  68198
United States
Phone: 402-559-4292
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - District of Columbia
USA - Nebraska

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 25 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWNA LEE BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2014