Boyne, Timothy Stephen (CPSO#: 56970)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2001