Bradbury, Penelope Ann (CPSO#: 85133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wales, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG Building PMH
700 University Avenue Suite 7-814
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416 946-4501 Ext. 3544
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Penelope Ann Bradbury may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        University of Toronto,  in which Dr. Bradbury holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bradbury
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.