Bradley, Lindsay Ann (CPSO#: 92991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
1125 Colonel By Dr
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lindsay Bradley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bradley ( CPSO# 92991 )

Business Address:
Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-3510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANN BRADLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012