Bradley, Timothy John (CPSO#: 78644)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2015