Bradshaw, Scott H (CPSO#: 90671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dynacare
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 6S4
Phone: (613) 453 1860
Fax: (613) 548 6076
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Bradshaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bradshaw ( CPSO# 90671 )

Business Address:
Dynacare
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 6S4
Phone Number: (613) 453-1860

Business Address:
281 Infusion Private
Ottawa ON  K2J 5X3
Phone Number: (613) 453-1860

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT H BRADSHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADSHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015