Bradwell, Saelle Lillian (CPSO#: 95995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 30 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: Hendry, Saelle Lillian (used until: 08 Feb 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone: 7056754883
Electoral District: 08

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAELLE LILLIAN BRADWELL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BRADWELL is enrolled at NORTHERN ONTARIO SCHOOL OF MEDICINE;

(2) Dr. BRADWELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BRADWELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BRADWELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BRADWELL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BRADWELL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019