Braga, Luis Henrique Perocco (CPSO#: 83041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 4E19
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73777
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Braga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Braga ( CPSO# 91227 )
Dr. L. Braga ( CPSO# 83041 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 4E19
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Luis Henrique Perocco Braga may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Urology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Braga holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when Dr. Braga  no
                  longer holds an appointment, referred to in cluase 1.




Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)