Braganza, Joseph Sebastian Rose-Mary (CPSO#: 32542)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Nov 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2013