Braidwood, Danielle (CPSO#: 89044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton Sports Medicine Clinic
Carleton University
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: 6135203510
Fax: 6135203974
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Braidwood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2014


Corporation Name: Mario Kontolemos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kontolemos ( CPSO# 96462 )
Dr. D. Braidwood ( CPSO# 89044 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neuroradiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4832

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE BRAIDWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIDWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016