Braithwaite-Walton, Heather Jean (CPSO#: 83142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 John St
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone: (905) 774-7431
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Regional Supervising Coroner
119 King Street West
13th Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 546-8200
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather J. Braithwaite-Walton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Braithwaite-Walton ( CPSO# 83142 )

Business Address:
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 774-7431


Corporation Name: Refling Braithwaite-Walton Zides Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JEAN BRAITHWAITE-WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAITHWAITE-WALTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)