Bral, Mariusz (CPSO#: 91950)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Aug 2009 to 25 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Oct 2009 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014