Brand, Christopher Paul (CPSO#: 31068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 184
2263 Highway 12
Brechin ON  L0K 1B0
Phone: (705) 484-5352
Fax: (705) 484-5400
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PAUL BRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 1999
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 May 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Mar 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2017

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Oct 2016
Summary:

On October 18, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Christopher Paul Brand committed an act of professional misconduct in 
that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable, or unprofessional. 

Dr. Brand, a family physician who currently practices in Brechin, Ontario, was the medical 
director of the Leacock Care Centre, a Long-Term Care Home licensed by the Ministry of Health 
and Long-Term Care (“MOHLTC”) at the time of the incident described below. 

One of the residents of the Centre, Patient A, was a man in his 70s with severe developmental 
delays since childhood and many serious behavioural challenges. Patient A is mostly nonverbal 
and has been in care for many years. Patient A often engaged in aggressive behaviour. This 
behaviour was described as being akin to “temper tantrums.” During these “tantrums,” he was 
observed to throw and bang on objects, throw himself on the floor, scream, yell and cry, and hit 
or kick out around him. 

On a date in November 2014, staff had been attempting to cut Patient A’s beard, and Patient A 
refused. Staff asked Dr. Brand to assist because he had trimmed Patient A’s beard before.  

When Dr. Brand approached, Patient A dropped to the floor and began kicking. Dr. Brand 
grabbed Patient A’s legs or feet and pulled him on the floor, up the hall to a conference room, 
which had previously been set aside as Patient A’s bedroom. Neither Dr. Brand nor Patient A 
suffered any injuries in this incident. 

At the time of the incident, residents were attending for breakfast and other activities in the area. 
The incident was observed by at least three staff members, including a nurse, as well as a 
compliance officer from the MOHLTC who happened to be in the building. 

The nurse who observed the incident asked Dr. Brand to stop dragging the resident by his feet. 
At that point, Dr. Brand had reached the door of the conference room. Dr. Brand was heard 
stating to Patient A, “you don’t want to get your hair cut,” as he pulled Patient A towards the 
conference room. Shortly after, Patient A exited the conference room, followed by Dr. Brand, 
who was holding hair clippers and an extension cord. Dr. Brand was heard to say, “guess the 
resident doesn’t want his hair cut then.” 

Shortly after the incident took place, the Administrator of the Centre informed Dr. Brand that 
this would not be tolerated. Dr. Brand replied by indicating it was Patient A they were talking 
about and that he had been Patient A’s doctor for many years. 

Very soon after, however, Dr. Brand acknowledged to the Administrator of the Centre that he 
should not have dragged Patient A and that it was an error in judgment. He stated that, after 
Patient A fell to the floor, Patient A started kicking, and for that reason Dr. Brand grabbed his 
foot, “so he didn’t hurt anyone or me.” 

At the time, Dr. Brand had recently undergone an abdominal surgery, and was concerned that 
Patient A’s kicking might injure Dr. Brand. He therefore decided to restrain Patient A’s feet and 
return him to his room. 

Dr. Brand was terminated by the Leacock Care Centre on December 2, 2014. 

 

PENALTY 

On October 18, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 

   -  Dr. Brand appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Brand’s certificate of registration for a two month period, to 
      commence at 12:01 a.m. on October 19, 2016.  
   -  The Registrar impose the following as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Brand’s 
      certificate of registration: 
         -  At his own expense, Dr. Brand shall participate in and successfully complete, 
            within 6 months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction satisfactory to 
            the College and with an instructor approved by the College (the “Instructor”), on 
            professional behavior and managing difficult patients.  The Instructor shall 
            provide a summative report to the College including his or her conclusion about 
            whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. Brand; and 
         -  Prior to commencing individualized instruction, Dr. Brand shall engage in self-
            study in medical ethics, which shall include a literature review with a written 
            report to be presented to, discussed with and reviewed by the Instructor. 
   -  Dr. Brand pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,000.00 
      within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 18, 2016


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jan 2002
Summary:

 On January 21, 2002, Dr. Brand was found guilty of professional misconduct, paragraph 1(1)33 of O. 
 Reg. 856/93, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee ordered, by way of joint submission:
- Costs to 
 the College in the amount of $5,000
- suspension for a period of 4 months, not to commence prior 
 to February 1, 2002 on a date satisfactory to the Registrar
- 3 months of the suspension will be 
 suspended provided Dr. Brand completes, at his own expense, an ethics couse satisfactory to the 
 Registrar to be completed within 12 months and the Registrar to be notified of the completion of 
 the course
- if course not completed within 12 months, the remainder of the suspension to go into 
 effect
- Reprimand to be recorded on the register

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 21, 2002