Brandon, Nicholas Charlie (CPSO#: 92763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Ontario
480 University Avenue, Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Phone: 647-260-7137
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood General And Marine
Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Family Medical Centre
387 Cedar Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2J2
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-4821
Fax: (519) 426-6649
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS CHARLIE BRANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012