Branson, Helen Maree (CPSO#: 80394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 May 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202956
Fax: (416) 813-8389
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 04 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 15 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Helen  Maree  Branson  may  practise  medicine independently in Diagnostic
            Radiology.