Brar, Mantaj Singh (CPSO#: 91208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 University Avenue
Suite 451
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 4702
Fax: 416-712-4747
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabur Brar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brar ( CPSO# 91208 )
Dr. N. Sabur ( CPSO# 95123 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 451
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite6-049
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANTAJ SINGH BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 26 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015