Brasch, Jennifer Susan (CPSO#: 63686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Room D-018
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32907
Fax: (905) 521-6059
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hamilton Clinic
200 Main Street East (lower level)
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-4567
Fax: (905) 523-4533
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Brasch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brasch ( CPSO# 63686 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Room D-018
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER SUSAN BRASCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRASCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992