Braschi, Sylvie Francine (CPSO#: 80187)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite De Nantes, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2010